THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:39:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164926700
Fax: 4164925460
Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-492-6700
Fax: 416-492-5460

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation (1065900)
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jul 2024

Corporation Name: Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164926700
Fax: 4164925460
Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-492-6700
Fax: 416-492-5460

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation (1065900)
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jul 2024

Corporation Name: Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIDA ELGAWLY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIDA ELGAWLY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994