THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:59:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Lemieux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Lemieux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMILLE MARIE LEMIEUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMIEUX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMILLE MARIE LEMIEUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMIEUX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994