THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 845 Regent Street South
Suite 105
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 674-7481
Fax: (705) 674-7113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniela Filippone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Filippone (CPSO#: 67903 )
Business Address: 105 - 845 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4T3
(705) 674-7481

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 845 Regent Street South
Suite 105
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 674-7481
Fax: (705) 674-7113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniela Filippone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Filippone (CPSO#: 67903 )
Business Address: 105 - 845 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4T3
(705) 674-7481

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA GIUSEPPINA SERAFINA FILIPPONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILIPPONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA GIUSEPPINA SERAFINA FILIPPONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILIPPONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994