THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:00:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARMENIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 61045
511 Maple Grove Drive
Oakville Ontario L6J 6X0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 466-7416
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamboyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hamboyan (CPSO#: 67920 )
Business Address: Suite 61045
511 Maple Grove Drive
Oakville Ontario L6J 6X0
(905) 466-7416

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARMENIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 61045
511 Maple Grove Drive
Oakville Ontario L6J 6X0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 466-7416
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamboyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hamboyan (CPSO#: 67920 )
Business Address: Suite 61045
511 Maple Grove Drive
Oakville Ontario L6J 6X0
(905) 466-7416

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERAG HAMBOYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMBOYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERAG HAMBOYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMBOYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994