THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:26:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 15-300 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-509-4595
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Munir Nathoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nathoo (CPSO#: 67924 )
Business Address: Suite 104
3050 Garden Street
Whitby Ontario L1R 2G7
(905) 430-5305
Business Address: 300 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1A2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 15-300 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-509-4595
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Munir Nathoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nathoo (CPSO#: 67924 )
Business Address: Suite 104
3050 Garden Street
Whitby Ontario L1R 2G7
(905) 430-5305
Business Address: 300 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1A2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUNIR FATEHALI AMARSI NATHOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATHOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUNIR FATEHALI AMARSI NATHOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATHOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994