THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
TBRHSC
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 6846000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Thacker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Thacker (CPSO#: 67927 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
TBRHSC
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 6846000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Thacker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Thacker (CPSO#: 67927 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ELDON JAMES THACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THACKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ELDON JAMES THACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THACKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Sep 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Sep 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994