THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:31:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite 3406
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7329
Fax: (613) 696-7126

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher A. Glover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Glover (CPSO#: 67939 )
Business Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
H4414
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7329

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite 3406
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7329
Fax: (613) 696-7126

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher A. Glover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Glover (CPSO#: 67939 )
Business Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
H4414
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7329

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW GLOVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLOVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW GLOVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLOVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994