THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:36:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 510
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-4380
Fax: (905) 273-4335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PC Molnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Molnar (CPSO#: 67959 )
Business Address: 510-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
9052734380

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 510
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-4380
Fax: (905) 273-4335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PC Molnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Molnar (CPSO#: 67959 )
Business Address: 510-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
9052734380

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA CATHERINE MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA CATHERINE MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994