THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:24:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gus Meglis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Meglis (CPSO#: 67960 )
Business Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
(416) 780-9986

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gus Meglis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Meglis (CPSO#: 67960 )
Business Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
(416) 780-9986

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUS MEGLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGLIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUS MEGLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGLIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994