THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Extension: 70166
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lambert (CPSO#: 67965 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 731-7700 Extn: 70166

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Extension: 70166
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lambert (CPSO#: 67965 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 731-7700 Extn: 70166

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDY CINDY-LYNN LAMBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDY CINDY-LYNN LAMBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994