THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:50:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical Centre
Suite 204
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 863-7407
Fax: (844) 874-3533
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miles Kealey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kealey (CPSO#: 67970 )
Business Address: 204-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
289-863-7407
Business Address: Oakville Hospital
3004 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical Centre
Suite 204
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 863-7407
Fax: (844) 874-3533
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miles Kealey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kealey (CPSO#: 67970 )
Business Address: 204-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
289-863-7407
Business Address: Oakville Hospital
3004 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILES STEVEN KEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEALEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILES STEVEN KEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEALEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994