THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:05:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-3675
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2175 Petawawa Boulevard, Suite # 1
Pembroke Ontario K8A 7G8
Phone: (613) 687-1499
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stefan Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boyle (CPSO#: 67980 )
Business Address: 1 - 2175 Petawawa Boulevard
Pembroke Ontario K8A 7G8
(613) 687-1499

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-3675
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2175 Petawawa Boulevard, Suite # 1
Pembroke Ontario K8A 7G8
Phone: (613) 687-1499
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stefan Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boyle (CPSO#: 67980 )
Business Address: 1 - 2175 Petawawa Boulevard
Pembroke Ontario K8A 7G8
(613) 687-1499

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFAN RENE BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFAN RENE BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994