THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:25:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fowler Kennedy Sport Med Clinic
3M Center
University of Western Ontario
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-3454
Fax: (519) 850-2496

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bauld Giffin (CPSO#: 68765 ) Dr. J. Giffin (CPSO#: 67996 )
Business Address: Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Center - University of Western Ontario
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3454
Business Address: Victoria Hospital - London Health Sciences Centre
391 South Street
London Ontario N6A 4G5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
1490 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Emergency Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
519-667-6538

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fowler Kennedy Sport Med Clinic
3M Center
University of Western Ontario
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-3454
Fax: (519) 850-2496

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bauld Giffin (CPSO#: 68765 ) Dr. J. Giffin (CPSO#: 67996 )
Business Address: Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Center - University of Western Ontario
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3454
Business Address: Victoria Hospital - London Health Sciences Centre
391 South Street
London Ontario N6A 4G5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
1490 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Emergency Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
519-667-6538

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES ROBERT GIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIFFIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES ROBERT GIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994