THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
1223 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6E 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 691-7385
Fax: (416) 691-7099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. D'Agrosa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Agrosa (CPSO#: 68007 )
Business Address: 301 - 1223 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6E 1B5
(416) 691-7385

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
1223 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6E 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 691-7385
Fax: (416) 691-7099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. D'Agrosa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Agrosa (CPSO#: 68007 )
Business Address: 301 - 1223 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6E 1B5
(416) 691-7385

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
22 Jul 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 22 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from July 22, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.Raffaele Michael
D'Agrosa, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. D'Agrosa
to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Raffaele Michael D'Agrosa has voluntarily relinquished his
prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances
and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended
from time to time, and summarized as follows:


Drug/Substance Relinquished Not Relinquished

Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) X

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) X

Controlled Drugs
(from Schedule G of the Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27) X

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other
Targeted Substances Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) X

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from July 22, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.Raffaele Michael
D'Agrosa, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. D'Agrosa
to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Raffaele Michael D'Agrosa has voluntarily relinquished his
prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances
and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended
from time to time, and summarized as follows:


Drug/Substance Relinquished Not Relinquished

Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) X

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) X

Controlled Drugs
(from Schedule G of the Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27) X

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other
Targeted Substances Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) X

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994