THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:03:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 509
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 799-9875
Fax: (289) 298-5339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Chou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chou (CPSO#: 68013 )
Business Address: 509 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
(905) 799-9875

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 509
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 799-9875
Fax: (289) 298-5339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Chou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chou (CPSO#: 68013 )
Business Address: 509 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
(905) 799-9875

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994