THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:12:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Care Group
P O Box 3251
35 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-6796
Fax: (807) 346-9015

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor J. Bon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bon (CPSO#: 68020 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Care Group
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
(807) 346-6796

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Care Group
P O Box 3251
35 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-6796
Fax: (807) 346-9015

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor J. Bon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bon (CPSO#: 68020 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Care Group
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
(807) 346-6796

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR JAMES BON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR JAMES BON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994