THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:02:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oasis Medical Centre
Unit 140
486 Advance Boulevard
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 727-3335
Fax: (519) 727-6288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juliana Bilibajkich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bilibajkich (CPSO#: 68022 )
Business Address: Unit 140
486 Advance Boulevard
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 0B8
(519) 727-3335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oasis Medical Centre
Unit 140
486 Advance Boulevard
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 727-3335
Fax: (519) 727-6288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juliana Bilibajkich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bilibajkich (CPSO#: 68022 )
Business Address: Unit 140
486 Advance Boulevard
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 0B8
(519) 727-3335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIANA BILIBAJKICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILIBAJKICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIANA BILIBAJKICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILIBAJKICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994