THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 444-7502
Fax: (416) 444-0025

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ying Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lu (CPSO#: 68032 )
Business Address: Suite 210
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3J5
(416) 444-7502

Corporation Name: Dr. Ying Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Feb 2009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 444-7502
Fax: (416) 444-0025

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ying Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lu (CPSO#: 68032 )
Business Address: Suite 210
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3J5
(416) 444-7502

Corporation Name: Dr. Ying Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Feb 2009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YING LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YING LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994