THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:34:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Sports Medicine Centre
40 George Street
Cambridge Ontario N1S 2M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 622-4529
Fax: (519) 622-3563
Address: Grand River Sports Medicine Centre
Kitchener Location
700 Strasburg Road
Kitchener Ontario N2E 2M2
Phone: (519) 571-7111
Fax: (519) 571-8145

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor L. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hall (CPSO#: 68049 )
Business Address: Grand River Sports Medicine
40 George Street
Cambridge Ontario N1S 2M8
(519) 622-4529
Business Address: Grand River Sports Medicine Centre
Kitchener Location
700 Strasburg Road
Kitchener Ontario N2E 2M2
(519) 571-7111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Sports Medicine Centre
40 George Street
Cambridge Ontario N1S 2M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 622-4529
Fax: (519) 622-3563
Address: Grand River Sports Medicine Centre
Kitchener Location
700 Strasburg Road
Kitchener Ontario N2E 2M2
Phone: (519) 571-7111
Fax: (519) 571-8145

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor L. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hall (CPSO#: 68049 )
Business Address: Grand River Sports Medicine
40 George Street
Cambridge Ontario N1S 2M8
(519) 622-4529
Business Address: Grand River Sports Medicine Centre
Kitchener Location
700 Strasburg Road
Kitchener Ontario N2E 2M2
(519) 571-7111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR LAWRENCE HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR LAWRENCE HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994