THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:34:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gwyn, Karin Marie Elizabeth Hahn (Used Until: 24 Sep 2006)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Regional Cancer Program
Medical Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. M. E. Hahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hahn (CPSO#: 68050 )
Business Address: London Regional Cancer Program
Medical Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8640

General Information

Former Name: Gwyn, Karin Marie Elizabeth Hahn (Used Until: 24 Sep 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Regional Cancer Program
Medical Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. M. E. Hahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hahn (CPSO#: 68050 )
Business Address: London Regional Cancer Program
Medical Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8640

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIN MARIE ELIZABETH HAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIN MARIE ELIZABETH HAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994