THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:13:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 510-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON L1W 3T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10350 Yonge St
suite 002
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5K9
Phone: 9052375433
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-1366 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4T 3A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-1246 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4T 1W7
Phone: 4169260262
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3905 Major Mackenzie Dr
unit 107
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J9
Phone: 9052375433
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta (CPSO#: 68051 )
Business Address: 330 Highway 7 E
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
9057075007
Business Address: 1366 Yonge St
Suite 301
Toronto ON M4T 3A7
4169260262
Business Address: 1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON L1W 3T7
905-683-1700
Business Address: 3905 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J9
Business Address: 10350 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5K9

Corporation Name: Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Oct 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 510-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON L1W 3T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10350 Yonge St
suite 002
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5K9
Phone: 9052375433
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-1366 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4T 3A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-1246 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4T 1W7
Phone: 4169260262
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3905 Major Mackenzie Dr
unit 107
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J9
Phone: 9052375433
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta (CPSO#: 68051 )
Business Address: 330 Highway 7 E
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
9057075007
Business Address: 1366 Yonge St
Suite 301
Toronto ON M4T 3A7
4169260262
Business Address: 1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON L1W 3T7
905-683-1700
Business Address: 3905 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J9
Business Address: 10350 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5K9

Corporation Name: Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Oct 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJESH GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJESH GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2021
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994