THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:47:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601 Harwood Avenue
Suite 202
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 427-0558
Fax: (905) 427-1268

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suha Eltayeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eltayeb (CPSO#: 68059 )
Business Address: 202 - 601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J5
(905) 427-0558

Corporation Name: Eltayeb and Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601 Harwood Avenue
Suite 202
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 427-0558
Fax: (905) 427-1268

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suha Eltayeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eltayeb (CPSO#: 68059 )
Business Address: 202 - 601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J5
(905) 427-0558

Corporation Name: Eltayeb and Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUHA AMIN ELSERSAWI ELTAYEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTAYEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUHA AMIN ELSERSAWI ELTAYEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTAYEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994