THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 507-2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-766-2718
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6-2035 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 0A8
Phone: 416-493-0003
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ko (CPSO#: 68063 )
Business Address: 1901 Yonge Street
Unit 4
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y8
416-483-0102
Business Address: 2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 1X6

Corporation Name: Sang Wook Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2005

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 507-2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-766-2718
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6-2035 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 0A8
Phone: 416-493-0003
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ko (CPSO#: 68063 )
Business Address: 1901 Yonge Street
Unit 4
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y8
416-483-0102
Business Address: 2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 1X6

Corporation Name: Sang Wook Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2005

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANG WOOK KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANG WOOK KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994