THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 14-B
Mississauga Ontario L5V 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 567-4622
Fax: (905) 567-7545

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: XINH HUYNH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Huynh (CPSO#: 68069 )
Business Address: 1011 Upper Middle Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 4L1
905-849-7007
Business Address: B-14-1240 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5V 1N3
905-567-4622

Corporation Name: Xinh Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 14-B
Mississauga Ontario L5V 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 567-4622
Fax: (905) 567-7545

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: XINH HUYNH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Huynh (CPSO#: 68069 )
Business Address: 1011 Upper Middle Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 4L1
905-849-7007
Business Address: B-14-1240 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5V 1N3
905-567-4622

Corporation Name: Xinh Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XINH HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XINH HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994