THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 43897
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Address: Brantford Medical Imaging
Unit 102
260 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 5L8
Phone: (519) 756-9889
Fax: (519) 756-1535
Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road Suite #103
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 828-2066
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Extension: 1210
Fax: (519) 429-6892
Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite LLE
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 2V8
Phone: (905) 387-4551
Fax: (905) 387-1966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Jurriaans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jurriaans (CPSO#: 68084 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L9G 4P6
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 43897
Business Address: Brantford Medical Imaging
Unit 102
260 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 5L8
(519) 756-9889
Business Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite LLE
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 2V8
(905) 387-4551
Business Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
103 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 828-2066
Business Address: Norfolk General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(519) 426-0130

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 43897
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Address: Brantford Medical Imaging
Unit 102
260 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 5L8
Phone: (519) 756-9889
Fax: (519) 756-1535
Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road Suite #103
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 828-2066
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Extension: 1210
Fax: (519) 429-6892
Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite LLE
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 2V8
Phone: (905) 387-4551
Fax: (905) 387-1966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Jurriaans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jurriaans (CPSO#: 68084 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L9G 4P6
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 43897
Business Address: Brantford Medical Imaging
Unit 102
260 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 5L8
(519) 756-9889
Business Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite LLE
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 2V8
(905) 387-4551
Business Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
103 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 828-2066
Business Address: Norfolk General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(519) 426-0130

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK JURRIAANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JURRIAANS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK JURRIAANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JURRIAANS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994