THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:05:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bialystok University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 43029
Fax: (416) 242-1025
Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-6315
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. DUDEK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Bialystok University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 43029
Fax: (416) 242-1025
Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-6315
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. DUDEK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALGORZATA DUDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALGORZATA DUDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bialystok University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994