THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:52:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BENGALI, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hosptial
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 58557
Fax: 9054946614
Address: Finchgate xray and ultrasound
40 Finchgate BLVD
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
Phone: 9057928440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Myhealth PET Centre
6870 Goreway dr. Unit 101
Mississauga, Ont
L4V1P4
Mississauga Ontario L4V 1P1
Phone: (416) 926-1593
Fax: (416) 926-8768
Address: 2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Phone: 1888480 4180
Fax: No Information Available
Address: lighthouse imaging
5 Fairview mall Drive
suit100/105
North York Ontario M2Z2Z1
Phone: 4164993559
Fax: 4164994631
Address: Lighthouse Imaging Finch Site
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite LL04
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 293-5940
Fax: (416) 292-6036
Address: Dixie xray associates
8333 Weston Road
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8E2
Phone: 9058507478
Fax: 9058506934

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nimu Ganguli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ganguli (CPSO#: 68092 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BENGALI, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hosptial
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 58557
Fax: 9054946614
Address: Finchgate xray and ultrasound
40 Finchgate BLVD
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
Phone: 9057928440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Myhealth PET Centre
6870 Goreway dr. Unit 101
Mississauga, Ont
L4V1P4
Mississauga Ontario L4V 1P1
Phone: (416) 926-1593
Fax: (416) 926-8768
Address: 2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Phone: 1888480 4180
Fax: No Information Available
Address: lighthouse imaging
5 Fairview mall Drive
suit100/105
North York Ontario M2Z2Z1
Phone: 4164993559
Fax: 4164994631
Address: Lighthouse Imaging Finch Site
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite LL04
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 293-5940
Fax: (416) 292-6036
Address: Dixie xray associates
8333 Weston Road
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8E2
Phone: 9058507478
Fax: 9058506934

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nimu Ganguli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ganguli (CPSO#: 68092 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATYAJIT NIMU GANGULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGULI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATYAJIT NIMU GANGULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGULI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994