THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:51:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Regional Rehab Centre, Hamilton Hea
300 Wellington St N
Hamilton, On
L8L 0A4
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 41214
Fax: (905) 577-8233

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nora Cullen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cullen (CPSO#: 68098 )
Business Address: West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
(416) 243-3600 Extn: 2088
Business Address: 300 Wellington St N
Hamilton General Hospital
Regional Rehab Centre
B1-123
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
905 521 2100 Extn: 41214

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Regional Rehab Centre, Hamilton Hea
300 Wellington St N
Hamilton, On
L8L 0A4
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 41214
Fax: (905) 577-8233

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nora Cullen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cullen (CPSO#: 68098 )
Business Address: West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
(416) 243-3600 Extn: 2088
Business Address: 300 Wellington St N
Hamilton General Hospital
Regional Rehab Centre
B1-123
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
905 521 2100 Extn: 41214

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORA KATHLEEN CULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULLEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORA KATHLEEN CULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULLEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994