THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:36:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6862
Fax: (705) 740-6898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Bartlett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bartlett (CPSO#: 68103 )
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite LL03
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 740-6862
Business Address: Peterborough Hospital
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6862
Fax: (705) 740-6898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Bartlett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bartlett (CPSO#: 68103 )
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite LL03
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 740-6862
Business Address: Peterborough Hospital
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORMAN RICHARD BARTLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORMAN RICHARD BARTLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994