THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 428
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 681-1103
Fax: (905) 681-0052
Address: Suite 207
3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Phone: 905-631-2080
Fax: 905-635-6215

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rameeta Lad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lad (CPSO#: 68118 )
Business Address: 207 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(905) 631-2080
Business Address: Unit 428
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2E3
(905) 681-1103

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 428
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 681-1103
Fax: (905) 681-0052
Address: Suite 207
3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Phone: 905-631-2080
Fax: 905-635-6215

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rameeta Lad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lad (CPSO#: 68118 )
Business Address: 207 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(905) 631-2080
Business Address: Unit 428
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2E3
(905) 681-1103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMEETA JANE LAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMEETA JANE LAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994