THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:43:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson 1
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 2155
Fax: (613) 544-4749

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen A. LaHaye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. LaHaye (CPSO#: 68119 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson 1
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 2155
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson 1
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 2155
Fax: (613) 544-4749

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen A. LaHaye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. LaHaye (CPSO#: 68119 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson 1
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 2155
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN ANDREW LAHAYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAHAYE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN ANDREW LAHAYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAHAYE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994