THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:24:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 311
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 321-2879
Fax: (416) 321-2855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 24 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eva Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kwok (CPSO#: 68120 )
Business Address: 311 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 321-2879

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 311
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 321-2879
Fax: (416) 321-2855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 24 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eva Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kwok (CPSO#: 68120 )
Business Address: 311 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 321-2879

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994