THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:33:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Vein Institute of Toronto
217 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 929-0834
Fax: (416) 929-0392
Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON M1P 2E5
Phone: 4162961911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P2E5
Phone: 416-431-8107
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 217 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J3
Phone: (416) 929-0834
Fax: (416) 929-0392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kundu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kundu (CPSO#: 68121 )
Business Address: 217 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J3
(416) 929-0834
Business Address: Suite 200
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
(416) 296-3911
Business Address: Suite 100
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
(416) 499-3559
Business Address: Room LL04
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
(416) 293-5940

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Vein Institute of Toronto
217 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 929-0834
Fax: (416) 929-0392
Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON M1P 2E5
Phone: 4162961911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P2E5
Phone: 416-431-8107
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 217 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J3
Phone: (416) 929-0834
Fax: (416) 929-0392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kundu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kundu (CPSO#: 68121 )
Business Address: 217 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J3
(416) 929-0834
Business Address: Suite 200
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
(416) 296-3911
Business Address: Suite 100
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
(416) 499-3559
Business Address: Room LL04
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
(416) 293-5940

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJOY KUNDU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNDU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJOY KUNDU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNDU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994