THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 796 Burnhampthorpe Road West,
Unit 2
Mississauga Ontario L5C 2R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 270-6454
Fax: (905) 270-6460

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chien Pham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pham (CPSO#: 68124 )
Business Address: Unit 2
796 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 2R9
(905) 270-6454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 796 Burnhampthorpe Road West,
Unit 2
Mississauga Ontario L5C 2R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 270-6454
Fax: (905) 270-6460

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chien Pham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pham (CPSO#: 68124 )
Business Address: Unit 2
796 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 2R9
(905) 270-6454

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIEN VU PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIEN VU PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994