THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:02:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 836 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 924-5871
Fax: (416) 588 5878
Address: 1339 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: (416) 924-5871
Fax: (416) 588 5878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luis Noronha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noronha (CPSO#: 68128 )
Business Address: 1339 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
(416) 924-5871
Business Address: 836 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1M2
(416) 924-5871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 836 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 924-5871
Fax: (416) 588 5878
Address: 1339 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: (416) 924-5871
Fax: (416) 588 5878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luis Noronha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noronha (CPSO#: 68128 )
Business Address: 1339 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
(416) 924-5871
Business Address: 836 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1M2
(416) 924-5871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUIS CARLOS EUGENIO NORONHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORONHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUIS CARLOS EUGENIO NORONHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORONHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994