THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:44:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Medical Health Centre
17730 Leslie St
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 836-6844
Fax: (905) 836-5158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 12 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Ng Tung Hing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng Tung Hing (CPSO#: 68129 )
Business Address: Suite 188
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8E4
(905) 836-6844

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Medical Health Centre
17730 Leslie St
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 836-6844
Fax: (905) 836-5158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 12 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Ng Tung Hing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng Tung Hing (CPSO#: 68129 )
Business Address: Suite 188
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8E4
(905) 836-6844

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD KWET KHIONG NG TUNG HING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG TUNG HING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD KWET KHIONG NG TUNG HING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG TUNG HING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994