THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:17:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Health Network
Shoniker Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1E 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7301
Fax: 437-780-5562
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7530
Fax: (905) 472-7371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng (CPSO#: 68130 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
416-281-7301
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Shoniker Clinic
2877 Ellesmere rd
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
416-281-7301
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
416-281-7301
Business Address: Markham - Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Health Network
Shoniker Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1E 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7301
Fax: 437-780-5562
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7530
Fax: (905) 472-7371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng (CPSO#: 68130 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
416-281-7301
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Shoniker Clinic
2877 Ellesmere rd
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
416-281-7301
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
416-281-7301
Business Address: Markham - Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994