THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bay College Medical Centre
C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Winnie W.S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lee (CPSO#: 68146 )
Business Address: Suite 106
350 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3N2
(905) 597-8668
Business Address: Bay College Medical Centre
C216 - 777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
(416) 977-8878
Business Address: 181 Bay St
cleveland clinic
30/F
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
4165076600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bay College Medical Centre
C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Winnie W.S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lee (CPSO#: 68146 )
Business Address: Suite 106
350 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3N2
(905) 597-8668
Business Address: Bay College Medical Centre
C216 - 777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
(416) 977-8878
Business Address: 181 Bay St
cleveland clinic
30/F
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
4165076600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WINNIE WING SUET LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WINNIE WING SUET LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994