THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:22:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-6690
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital Corp
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-3300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. X. Reinders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Reinders (CPSO#: 68152 )
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-6690
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital Corp
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-3300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. X. Reinders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Reinders (CPSO#: 68152 )
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCIS XAVIER REINDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REINDERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCIS XAVIER REINDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REINDERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994