THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-2005
Fax: (905) 889-2006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mani Raman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Raman (CPSO#: 68154 )
Business Address: 312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1A5
(905) 889-2005

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-2005
Fax: (905) 889-2006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mani Raman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Raman (CPSO#: 68154 )
Business Address: 312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1A5
(905) 889-2005

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANI RAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANI RAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994