THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:20:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5507
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 main street
Cambridge Ontario N1R 6P9
Phone: (519) 624-6311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Safar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Safar (CPSO#: 68163 )
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5858
Business Address: OATC Cambridge
150 Main Street
Cambridge Ontario N1R 6P9
(519) 624-6311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5507
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 main street
Cambridge Ontario N1R 6P9
Phone: (519) 624-6311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Safar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Safar (CPSO#: 68163 )
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5858
Business Address: OATC Cambridge
150 Main Street
Cambridge Ontario N1R 6P9
(519) 624-6311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY CARL SAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY CARL SAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994