THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:29:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, LATVIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gundars Roze Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boyd (CPSO#: 91382 ) Dr. G. Roze (CPSO#: 68164 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Toronto Ontario L4Z 4Z3
(905) 883-2100
Business Address: 4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge Ontario K9P 1S4
(905) 472-7373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, LATVIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gundars Roze Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boyd (CPSO#: 91382 ) Dr. G. Roze (CPSO#: 68164 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Toronto Ontario L4Z 4Z3
(905) 883-2100
Business Address: 4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge Ontario K9P 1S4
(905) 472-7373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUNDARS EDGARS ROZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUNDARS EDGARS ROZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Jun 2016
Summary:
Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective October 4, 2018.
 
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Jun 2016
Summary:
Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective October 4, 2018.
 
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994