THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 307
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766-4587
Fax: (416) 766-5076
Address: 30 the queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R1B5
Phone: 416-766-4587
Fax: 416-766-5076
Address: Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 28 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Springer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Springer (CPSO#: 68173 )
Business Address: 225 - 4600 Highway #7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(416) 650-0017
Business Address: Suite 307
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 3A6
Business Address: 4600 Highway #7
Suite 200
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-2626
Business Address: GI Unit
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6156

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 307
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766-4587
Fax: (416) 766-5076
Address: 30 the queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R1B5
Phone: 416-766-4587
Fax: 416-766-5076
Address: Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 28 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Springer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Springer (CPSO#: 68173 )
Business Address: 225 - 4600 Highway #7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(416) 650-0017
Business Address: Suite 307
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 3A6
Business Address: 4600 Highway #7
Suite 200
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-2626
Business Address: GI Unit
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6156

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHON ESY SPRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHON ESY SPRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994