THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:14:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care
Eye Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6272
Fax: (519) 646-6410

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cindy Hutnik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hutnik (CPSO#: 68179 )
Business Address: Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care
Eye Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000

Corporation Name: Hutnik St. Amand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jan 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care
Eye Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6272
Fax: (519) 646-6410

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cindy Hutnik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hutnik (CPSO#: 68179 )
Business Address: Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care
Eye Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000

Corporation Name: Hutnik St. Amand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jan 2014

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY MARY-LYNN HUTNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTNIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY MARY-LYNN HUTNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTNIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994