THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:43:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-55 Angeline St N
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 324-2561
Fax: (705) 328-1816

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven C. Hainer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hainer (CPSO#: 68180 )
Business Address: Suite 4
55 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5B7
(705) 324-2561

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-55 Angeline St N
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 324-2561
Fax: (705) 328-1816

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven C. Hainer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hainer (CPSO#: 68180 )
Business Address: Suite 4
55 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5B7
(705) 324-2561

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN CHARLES HAINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAINER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN CHARLES HAINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAINER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994