THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:41:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 111
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-0883
Fax: (905) 303-0338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ambrose Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee (CPSO#: 68183 )
Business Address: Suite 112
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 303-0883
Business Address: 111-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Vaughan ON L6A 4P9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 111
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-0883
Fax: (905) 303-0338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ambrose Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee (CPSO#: 68183 )
Business Address: Suite 112
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 303-0883
Business Address: 111-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Vaughan ON L6A 4P9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBROSE WAI-MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBROSE WAI-MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994