THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:27:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
700 University Ave Suite 6-322
Dept of Medical Oncology and
Haematology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4566
Fax: (416) 946-4563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzanne Trudel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Trudel (CPSO#: 68194 )
Business Address: Suite 6-322
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 946-4566

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
700 University Ave Suite 6-322
Dept of Medical Oncology and
Haematology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4566
Fax: (416) 946-4563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzanne Trudel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Trudel (CPSO#: 68194 )
Business Address: Suite 6-322
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 946-4566

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE TRUDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUDEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE TRUDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUDEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994