THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:43:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: Toffoli, Nadia Diana (Used Until: 18 Aug 1997)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-2201
Fax: (905) 832-2246

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Toffoli-Zadra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Toffoli Zadra (CPSO#: 68195 )
Business Address: Suite 210
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 832-2201

General Information

Former Name: Toffoli, Nadia Diana (Used Until: 18 Aug 1997)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-2201
Fax: (905) 832-2246

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Toffoli-Zadra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Toffoli Zadra (CPSO#: 68195 )
Business Address: Suite 210
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 832-2201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA DIANA TOFFOLI ZADRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOFFOLI ZADRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA DIANA TOFFOLI ZADRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOFFOLI ZADRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994