THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Berczy Medical Clinic
Unit 3
20 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham Ontario L6C 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 887-3399
Fax: (905) 887-0462

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian W Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lo (CPSO#: 68204 )
Business Address: Berczy Medical Clinic
3 - 20 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham Ontario L6C 0A2
(905) 887-3399

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Berczy Medical Clinic
Unit 3
20 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham Ontario L6C 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 887-3399
Fax: (905) 887-0462

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian W Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lo (CPSO#: 68204 )
Business Address: Berczy Medical Clinic
3 - 20 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham Ontario L6C 0A2
(905) 887-3399

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN WAI-CHIT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN WAI-CHIT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994