THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 233
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 415-0800
Fax: (905) 415-0801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hayvin Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee (CPSO#: 68205 )
Business Address: Unit 233
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
(905) 415-0800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 233
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 415-0800
Fax: (905) 415-0801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hayvin Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee (CPSO#: 68205 )
Business Address: Unit 233
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
(905) 415-0800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAYVIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAYVIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994